THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107 Wellington Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 544 3962
Fax: 613 817 1821
Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St.
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 2423
Fax: (613) 548-2329

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Newman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Newman (CPSO#: 63511 )
Business Address: 800 John Marks Ave
Kingston ON K7K 0J7
613 507 7246 Extn: 138

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107 Wellington Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 544 3962
Fax: 613 817 1821
Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St.
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 2423
Fax: (613) 548-2329

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Newman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Newman (CPSO#: 63511 )
Business Address: 800 John Marks Ave
Kingston ON K7K 0J7
613 507 7246 Extn: 138

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM ISAIAH SEBASTIAN SHUN NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM ISAIAH SEBASTIAN SHUN NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 03 May 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 03 May 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991