THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:06:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 984 Oliver Road
Suite 102
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 766-3599
Fax: (807) 766-3598

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 26 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.D. McCluskey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McCluskey (CPSO#: 63554 )
Business Address: 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 767-3599

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 984 Oliver Road
Suite 102
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 766-3599
Fax: (807) 766-3598

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 26 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.D. McCluskey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McCluskey (CPSO#: 63554 )
Business Address: 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 767-3599

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN DOUGLAS MCCLUSKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLUSKEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN DOUGLAS MCCLUSKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLUSKEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991