THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Department of Anaesthesia
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Fax: (613) 737-4815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jarmila Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kim (CPSO#: 63563 )
Business Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-2431

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Department of Anaesthesia
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Fax: (613) 737-4815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jarmila Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kim (CPSO#: 63563 )
Business Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-2431

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JARMILA KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JARMILA KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991