THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Suite 104
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leduc (CPSO#: 63565 )
Business Address: 100 - 2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1298

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Suite 104
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leduc (CPSO#: 63565 )
Business Address: 100 - 2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1298

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEAN CAREY LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEAN CAREY LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Sep 2018
Summary of Decision:
On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dean Carey Leduc committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Leduc is a general practitioner, with a practice in Orleans, Ontario. At all materials times, Dr.Leduc practised in a clinic setting that also operates as a walk-in clinic with 12 physicians.

Patient A became a patient of Dr. Leduc in the late 1990s, when she was a teenager. Between approximately September 2003 and September 2013, Patient A saw Dr. Leduc for a variety of physical issues, including pain associated with ankle and humerus fractures and a dislocating shoulder, for which she eventually received disability insurance. Patient A also saw Dr.Leduc for a range of psychiatric issues, including an eating disorder, depression, anxiety, addiction to alcohol, addiction to narcotics and benzodiazepines, chronic pain and PTSD.

Standard of Practice with Respect to Patient A

After receiving information in September 2013, the College conducted an investigation into the allegations regarding Dr. Leduc's conduct and clinical care with respect to Patient A. An expert retained by the College reviewed Dr. Leduc's care of Patient A, including his prescribing of narcotics and related substances and opined, in part, that Dr. Leduc’s care of Patient A demonstrates:

- a significant lack of knowledge regarding safe prescribing habits for narcotics and benzodiazepines;
- a significant lack of skill in managing Patient A’s numerous aberrant behaviors; and
- a staggering lack of judgment in his continuing prescriptions of medications to Patient A, while being aware of the risk of addiction and harm to this patient.

The expert noted that while he cannot say with certainty that Dr. Leduc's clinical practice, behaviour, or conduct expose or are likely to expose other patients to harm or injury, there are a number of indicators that raise concern.

Boundary Violations with respect to Patient A

In 2011, Patient A experienced a traumatic personal event and confided in Dr. Leduc. After discussing the events in some detail, and providing counselling, Dr. Leduc hugged Patient A in his office. Over the next two years, Dr. Leduc and Patient A would often hug at the end of an appointment.

About a year later, criminal proceedings regarding the events of 2011 took place. During the proceedings, Dr. Leduc called Patient A from his cell phone and asked if she wanted to meet and talk. They arranged a time and place to meet and, once they had met, they went to a restaurant. Despite his knowledge that Patient A struggled with alcohol addiction, and the fact that she was on medications that he had prescribed to her, Dr. Leduc did not object to Patient A ordering wine, which he paid for in addition to her meal. Dr. Leduc disclosed personal information to Patient A during their discussion and, at the end of the encounter, Dr. Leduc drove Patient A home. Patient A continued to see Dr. Leduc after this meeting for regular follow up care and for supportive counselling. At this time, Dr. Leduc was prescribing Patient A large doses of Demerol by tablet and by injection, as well as benzodiazepines.

A couple of months later, in 2012, Patient A experienced further physical trauma and, as a result of her injuries, Dr. Leduc assisted with her application for disability coverage. In late September 2012, Dr. Leduc contacted Patient A again and offered to meet outside the office to talk. They met at a coffee shop during the day and talked for about one hour. At the end of the encounter they walked to Dr. Leduc's car and he drove Patient A home. Between June and September 2012,Dr. Leduc called Patient A on a few occasions from his cell phone. Patient A continued to see Dr. Leduc after the encounter in late September for regular follow up care, including her pain and mood medications, and for supportive counselling.

In the spring of 2013, Dr. Leduc and Patient A met for a third time outside of his office. On this occasion, they met outside Patient A's apartment and walked from there to a restaurant, where Dr. Leduc again paid for Patient A's lunch and alcoholic drink. Dr. Leduc hugged Patient A and/or they exchanged kisses on the cheek during one or more than one of the three out of office
encounters.

Dr. Leduc recognizes that his conduct was inappropriate conduct for a physician towards his patient and that it breached physician-patient boundaries, especially in the context of Patient A's vulnerabilities. Dr. Leduc knew that Patient A had very few people she trusted or could turn to for support and, during this time, she endured significant physical and emotional trauma.

Registrar’s Investigation

In July 2015, as a result of the concerns regarding Dr. Leduc’s prescribing to Patient A raised in the expert’s report, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (ICRC) approved an appointment of investigators in order to conduct a broader investigation into Dr. Leduc’s prescribing practices. Another expert was retained by the College to provide an opinion with respect to Dr. Leduc’s standard of care, including his prescribing of narcotics and benzodiazepines. This expert reviewed ten patient charts and conducted an interview with Dr.Leduc, during which Dr. Leduc advised that after receiving notice of the public complaint, he completed the three-part Safe Opioid Prescribing program at the University of Toronto in January 2014.

Upon the College’s request, the expert provided an addendum report, dated February 21, 2017,with respect to the standard of care provided by Dr. Leduc before he took the Safe Opioid Prescribing program and made changes to his practice. The expert opined that prior to January 2014, Dr. Leduc:

- did not meet the standard of practice of the profession in six out of ten charts;
- displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment in seven out of ten charts; and
- in five out of ten charts, Dr. Leduc’s clinical practice exposed patients to harm or injury.
 Relevant Remediation and Education

At the conclusion of the Registrar’s Investigation, the ICRC reviewed and considered the material and ordered Dr. Leduc to participate in a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (SCERP), which required Dr. Leduc, among other things, to:

- practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor for a period of six months;
- re-take all three webinars and the workshop that comprise the Safe Opioid Prescribing program at the University of Toronto; and
- have biweekly meetings with the supervisor for two months and monthly meetings for four months.

Dr. Leduc registered in and successfully completed the three-part series from March to May 2018, and completed the workshop component in June 2018. Dr. Leduc’s clinical supervisor conducted the supervision between December 2017 and May 2018, and provided a total of eight reports to the College’s Compliance Case Manager. Dr. Leduc has completed all aspects of the SCERP with the exception of the reassessment, which was directed to occur approximately six months following the completion of the remediation.

In addition, Dr. Leduc enrolled in and successfully completed a boundaries course at the Schulich School of Medicine at the University of Western Ontario on March 21 to 22, 2014.

Disposition

On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

- Dr. Leduc attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Leduc's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, effective immediately.
- Dr. Leduc pay to the College costs in the amount of $16,012.00, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 17, 2018

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Sep 2017
Summary:
Effective November 28, 2019, Dr. Leduc has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Sep 2018
Summary of Decision:
On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dean Carey Leduc committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Leduc is a general practitioner, with a practice in Orleans, Ontario. At all materials times, Dr.Leduc practised in a clinic setting that also operates as a walk-in clinic with 12 physicians.

Patient A became a patient of Dr. Leduc in the late 1990s, when she was a teenager. Between approximately September 2003 and September 2013, Patient A saw Dr. Leduc for a variety of physical issues, including pain associated with ankle and humerus fractures and a dislocating shoulder, for which she eventually received disability insurance. Patient A also saw Dr.Leduc for a range of psychiatric issues, including an eating disorder, depression, anxiety, addiction to alcohol, addiction to narcotics and benzodiazepines, chronic pain and PTSD.

Standard of Practice with Respect to Patient A

After receiving information in September 2013, the College conducted an investigation into the allegations regarding Dr. Leduc's conduct and clinical care with respect to Patient A. An expert retained by the College reviewed Dr. Leduc's care of Patient A, including his prescribing of narcotics and related substances and opined, in part, that Dr. Leduc’s care of Patient A demonstrates:

- a significant lack of knowledge regarding safe prescribing habits for narcotics and benzodiazepines;
- a significant lack of skill in managing Patient A’s numerous aberrant behaviors; and
- a staggering lack of judgment in his continuing prescriptions of medications to Patient A, while being aware of the risk of addiction and harm to this patient.

The expert noted that while he cannot say with certainty that Dr. Leduc's clinical practice, behaviour, or conduct expose or are likely to expose other patients to harm or injury, there are a number of indicators that raise concern.

Boundary Violations with respect to Patient A

In 2011, Patient A experienced a traumatic personal event and confided in Dr. Leduc. After discussing the events in some detail, and providing counselling, Dr. Leduc hugged Patient A in his office. Over the next two years, Dr. Leduc and Patient A would often hug at the end of an appointment.

About a year later, criminal proceedings regarding the events of 2011 took place. During the proceedings, Dr. Leduc called Patient A from his cell phone and asked if she wanted to meet and talk. They arranged a time and place to meet and, once they had met, they went to a restaurant. Despite his knowledge that Patient A struggled with alcohol addiction, and the fact that she was on medications that he had prescribed to her, Dr. Leduc did not object to Patient A ordering wine, which he paid for in addition to her meal. Dr. Leduc disclosed personal information to Patient A during their discussion and, at the end of the encounter, Dr. Leduc drove Patient A home. Patient A continued to see Dr. Leduc after this meeting for regular follow up care and for supportive counselling. At this time, Dr. Leduc was prescribing Patient A large doses of Demerol by tablet and by injection, as well as benzodiazepines.

A couple of months later, in 2012, Patient A experienced further physical trauma and, as a result of her injuries, Dr. Leduc assisted with her application for disability coverage. In late September 2012, Dr. Leduc contacted Patient A again and offered to meet outside the office to talk. They met at a coffee shop during the day and talked for about one hour. At the end of the encounter they walked to Dr. Leduc's car and he drove Patient A home. Between June and September 2012,Dr. Leduc called Patient A on a few occasions from his cell phone. Patient A continued to see Dr. Leduc after the encounter in late September for regular follow up care, including her pain and mood medications, and for supportive counselling.

In the spring of 2013, Dr. Leduc and Patient A met for a third time outside of his office. On this occasion, they met outside Patient A's apartment and walked from there to a restaurant, where Dr. Leduc again paid for Patient A's lunch and alcoholic drink. Dr. Leduc hugged Patient A and/or they exchanged kisses on the cheek during one or more than one of the three out of office
encounters.

Dr. Leduc recognizes that his conduct was inappropriate conduct for a physician towards his patient and that it breached physician-patient boundaries, especially in the context of Patient A's vulnerabilities. Dr. Leduc knew that Patient A had very few people she trusted or could turn to for support and, during this time, she endured significant physical and emotional trauma.

Registrar’s Investigation

In July 2015, as a result of the concerns regarding Dr. Leduc’s prescribing to Patient A raised in the expert’s report, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (ICRC) approved an appointment of investigators in order to conduct a broader investigation into Dr. Leduc’s prescribing practices. Another expert was retained by the College to provide an opinion with respect to Dr. Leduc’s standard of care, including his prescribing of narcotics and benzodiazepines. This expert reviewed ten patient charts and conducted an interview with Dr.Leduc, during which Dr. Leduc advised that after receiving notice of the public complaint, he completed the three-part Safe Opioid Prescribing program at the University of Toronto in January 2014.

Upon the College’s request, the expert provided an addendum report, dated February 21, 2017,with respect to the standard of care provided by Dr. Leduc before he took the Safe Opioid Prescribing program and made changes to his practice. The expert opined that prior to January 2014, Dr. Leduc:

- did not meet the standard of practice of the profession in six out of ten charts;
- displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment in seven out of ten charts; and
- in five out of ten charts, Dr. Leduc’s clinical practice exposed patients to harm or injury.
 Relevant Remediation and Education

At the conclusion of the Registrar’s Investigation, the ICRC reviewed and considered the material and ordered Dr. Leduc to participate in a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (SCERP), which required Dr. Leduc, among other things, to:

- practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor for a period of six months;
- re-take all three webinars and the workshop that comprise the Safe Opioid Prescribing program at the University of Toronto; and
- have biweekly meetings with the supervisor for two months and monthly meetings for four months.

Dr. Leduc registered in and successfully completed the three-part series from March to May 2018, and completed the workshop component in June 2018. Dr. Leduc’s clinical supervisor conducted the supervision between December 2017 and May 2018, and provided a total of eight reports to the College’s Compliance Case Manager. Dr. Leduc has completed all aspects of the SCERP with the exception of the reassessment, which was directed to occur approximately six months following the completion of the remediation.

In addition, Dr. Leduc enrolled in and successfully completed a boundaries course at the Schulich School of Medicine at the University of Western Ontario on March 21 to 22, 2014.

Disposition

On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

- Dr. Leduc attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Leduc's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, effective immediately.
- Dr. Leduc pay to the College costs in the amount of $16,012.00, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 17, 2018

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Sep 2017
Summary:
Effective November 28, 2019, Dr. Leduc has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 17 Mar 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991