THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:05:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Phone: 519-824-1010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Chovanec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chovanec (CPSO#: 63566 )
Business Address: Homewood Health Care
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
(519) 824-1010
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Phone: 519-824-1010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Chovanec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chovanec (CPSO#: 63566 )
Business Address: Homewood Health Care
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
(519) 824-1010
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILAN CHOVANEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOVANEC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILAN CHOVANEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOVANEC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991