THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:24:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Cirone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cirone (CPSO#: 63582 )
Business Address: 105 Sorauren Ave
Toronto ON M6R 2E3

Corporation Name: R. Cirone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Cirone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cirone (CPSO#: 63582 )
Business Address: 105 Sorauren Ave
Toronto ON M6R 2E3

Corporation Name: R. Cirone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CIRONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIRONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CIRONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIRONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991