THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:33:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Kishinev State Medical Institute, 1972
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7131 Bathurst Street
Suite 305
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 882-6798
Fax: (905) 882-6448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roitberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Roitberg (CPSO#: 63614 )
Business Address: Suite 305
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1Z7
(905) 882-6798

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN
Medical School: The Kishinev State Medical Institute, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7131 Bathurst Street
Suite 305
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 882-6798
Fax: (905) 882-6448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roitberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Roitberg (CPSO#: 63614 )
Business Address: Suite 305
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1Z7
(905) 882-6798

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INNA ROITBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROITBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INNA ROITBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROITBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Kishinev State Medical Institute, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991