THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite LL1C
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 298-2757
Fax: (416) 298-2757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Hew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hew (CPSO#: 63639 )
Business Address: LL1C - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 298-2757

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite LL1C
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 298-2757
Fax: (416) 298-2757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Hew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hew (CPSO#: 63639 )
Business Address: LL1C - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 298-2757

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH HEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH HEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991