THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:21:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-6410
Fax: (519) 749-6411
Address: Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 3H1
Phone: (226)240-3014
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4242
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 435 King Street North
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2Z5
Phone: (519)603-0641
Fax: (519)603-0650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Waldbillig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Waldbillig (CPSO#: 63642 )
Business Address: 836 King Street West
Grand River Hospital, Kitchener
Surgery Department
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E8
(519)749-4300
Business Address: 435 King Street North
MSKcentre
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2Z5
(519)603-0641
Business Address: Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 3H1
(226) 240-3014
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-6410
Fax: (519) 749-6411
Address: Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 3H1
Phone: (226)240-3014
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4242
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 435 King Street North
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2Z5
Phone: (519)603-0641
Fax: (519)603-0650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Waldbillig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Waldbillig (CPSO#: 63642 )
Business Address: 836 King Street West
Grand River Hospital, Kitchener
Surgery Department
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E8
(519)749-4300
Business Address: 435 King Street North
MSKcentre
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2Z5
(519)603-0641
Business Address: Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 3H1
(226) 240-3014
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KELLY WALDBILLIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDBILLIG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KELLY WALDBILLIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDBILLIG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991