THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Suite 4-179
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gough Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gough (CPSO#: 63646 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 4-179
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Suite 4-179
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gough Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gough (CPSO#: 63646 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 4-179
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ALBAN GOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOUGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ALBAN GOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOUGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991