THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:03:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Front Street
Veterans Affairs Canada
Quinte West Ontario K8V 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-866-522-2122
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 49 Place D'Armes
Ontario Ministry of Health
Kingston Ontario K7K 6Z6
Phone: 613-548-6637
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry R. Guppy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Guppy (CPSO#: 63647 )
Business Address: 17 Front Street
Suite 15
Quinte West Ontario K8V 4N3
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
Belleville General
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 979-7400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Front Street
Veterans Affairs Canada
Quinte West Ontario K8V 4N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-866-522-2122
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 49 Place D'Armes
Ontario Ministry of Health
Kingston Ontario K7K 6Z6
Phone: 613-548-6637
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry R. Guppy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Guppy (CPSO#: 63647 )
Business Address: 17 Front Street
Suite 15
Quinte West Ontario K8V 4N3
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
Belleville General
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 979-7400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY ROBERT GUPPY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPPY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY ROBERT GUPPY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPPY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991