THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 07:52:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 202
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Address: 2-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
Phone: 705-788-3623
Fax: 705-788-3624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David McLinden and Nancy Bozek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McLinden (CPSO#: 63654 ) Dr. N. Bozek (CPSO#: 63715 )
Business Address: 202 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 788-3623
Business Address: 2-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
7057883623

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 202
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Address: 2-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
Phone: 705-788-3623
Fax: 705-788-3624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David McLinden and Nancy Bozek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McLinden (CPSO#: 63654 ) Dr. N. Bozek (CPSO#: 63715 )
Business Address: 202 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 788-3623
Business Address: 2-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
7057883623

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NORMAN MCLINDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLINDEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NORMAN MCLINDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLINDEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991