THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:34:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 42562
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: 905 387 4551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CIBC Breast Assessment Centre
711 Concession Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Rd Suite 103
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Phone: 908 828 2066
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Finlay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Finlay (CPSO#: 63655 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Henderson Division
711 Concession Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 43897

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 42562
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: 905 387 4551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CIBC Breast Assessment Centre
711 Concession Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Rd Suite 103
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Phone: 908 828 2066
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Finlay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Finlay (CPSO#: 63655 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Henderson Division
711 Concession Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 43897

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN FINLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN FINLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991