THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-5333
Fax: (905) 357-0668

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George E. Harpur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Harpur (CPSO#: 63668 )
Business Address: 301 - 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
(905) 357-5333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-5333
Fax: (905) 357-0668

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George E. Harpur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Harpur (CPSO#: 63668 )
Business Address: 301 - 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
(905) 357-5333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE EDWARD HARPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARPUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE EDWARD HARPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARPUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991