THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:09:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RS McLaughlin Durham Regional
Cancer Centre
Suite C2 160F
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 4808
Fax: (905) 433-4577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. John Dickie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dickie (CPSO#: 63687 )
Business Address: RS McLaughlin Durham Regional
Cancer Centre
Suite C2 160F
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 4808

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RS McLaughlin Durham Regional
Cancer Centre
Suite C2 160F
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 4808
Fax: (905) 433-4577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. John Dickie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dickie (CPSO#: 63687 )
Business Address: RS McLaughlin Durham Regional
Cancer Centre
Suite C2 160F
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 4808

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN DUNDAS DICKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN DUNDAS DICKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991