THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:42:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Rm 1266A
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 2775
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra Easson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Easson (CPSO#: 63690 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Rm 6-723 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2328
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Room 1266A
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
4165864800 Extn: 2775

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Rm 1266A
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 2775
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra Easson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Easson (CPSO#: 63690 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Rm 6-723 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2328
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Room 1266A
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
4165864800 Extn: 2775

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA MARIA EASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA MARIA EASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991