THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:07:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 Andrew St
Handworx Inc
Unit 102
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-576-0620
Fax: 519-576-5729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Schuringa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schuringa (CPSO#: 63702 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 Andrew St
Handworx Inc
Unit 102
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-576-0620
Fax: 519-576-5729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Schuringa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schuringa (CPSO#: 63702 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER COLIN RANDOLPH SCHURINGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHURINGA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER COLIN RANDOLPH SCHURINGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHURINGA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991