THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:39:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard East
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 336-4103
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Strang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Strang (CPSO#: 63704 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard East
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 336-4103
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Strang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Strang (CPSO#: 63704 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA KATHLEEN STRANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA KATHLEEN STRANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991