THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Mill Street
Gananoque Ontario K7G 2L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 382-3974
Fax: (613) 382-4417

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hart (CPSO#: 63710 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Mill Street
Gananoque Ontario K7G 2L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 382-3974
Fax: (613) 382-4417

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hart (CPSO#: 63710 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1991