THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:45:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
1NE-744
4001 Leslie St.
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Extension: 3339
Fax: (416) 635-2401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelvin Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mak (CPSO#: 63712 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000 Extn: 3369
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Site
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
1NE-744
4001 Leslie St.
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Extension: 3339
Fax: (416) 635-2401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelvin Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mak (CPSO#: 63712 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000 Extn: 3369
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Site
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELVIN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELVIN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991