THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1077 North Service Road
Unit 27
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 949-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 79 Dundas St West
Mississauga
ontario
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1Z4
Phone: (905) 275-1309
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Queensway West
Mississauga,Ontario
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 275-3912
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shelley Mallette-Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mallette-Edwards (CPSO#: 63717 )
Business Address: 79 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1H7
Business Address: Unit 27
1077 North Service Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1A6
(905) 949-1700
Business Address: 170 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
(905) 275-3912

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1077 North Service Road
Unit 27
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 949-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 79 Dundas St West
Mississauga
ontario
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1Z4
Phone: (905) 275-1309
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Queensway West
Mississauga,Ontario
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 275-3912
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shelley Mallette-Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mallette-Edwards (CPSO#: 63717 )
Business Address: 79 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1H7
Business Address: Unit 27
1077 North Service Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1A6
(905) 949-1700
Business Address: 170 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
(905) 275-3912

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELLEY ANNE MALLETTE-EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLETTE-EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELLEY ANNE MALLETTE-EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLETTE-EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991