THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:02:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph Medical Place 1
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 763-4315

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin S. Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Librach (CPSO#: 63720 )
Business Address: Guelph Medical Place
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph Medical Place 1
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 763-4315

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin S. Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Librach (CPSO#: 63720 )
Business Address: Guelph Medical Place
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN STUART LIBRACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBRACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN STUART LIBRACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBRACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991