THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:12:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-6072
Fax: (613) 548-1330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chamberlain (CPSO#: 63743 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-6071

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-6072
Fax: (613) 548-1330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chamberlain (CPSO#: 63743 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-6071

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARIE CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARIE CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991