THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:37:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Diagnostic Imaging Department
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5039
Fax: (705) 743-1713
Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Millitz/Peters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Millitz (CPSO#: 63758 ) Dr. G. Peters (CPSO#: 59499 )
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: Peterborough Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5022

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Diagnostic Imaging Department
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5039
Fax: (705) 743-1713
Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Millitz/Peters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Millitz (CPSO#: 63758 ) Dr. G. Peters (CPSO#: 59499 )
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: Peterborough Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5022

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIP MILLITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLITZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIP MILLITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLITZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991