THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:51:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1275 Walker Road
Unit 5
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-9337
Fax: (519) 255-9374

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Charron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Charron (CPSO#: 63761 )
Business Address: Unit 5
1275 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
(519) 255-9337

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1275 Walker Road
Unit 5
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-9337
Fax: (519) 255-9374

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Charron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Charron (CPSO#: 63761 )
Business Address: Unit 5
1275 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
(519) 255-9337

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK MICHAEL CHARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARRON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK MICHAEL CHARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARRON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991