THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:49:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clear Medical Imaging
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 256-4914
Fax: (519) 256-4358
Address: Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot St W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: 519-326-2373
Extension: 4416
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A1E1
Phone: 519-972-4411
Extension: 37527
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brigitte Ala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ala (CPSO#: 63766 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: Windsor Radiological Associates
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
(519) 256-4914
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4412 Extn: 37531
Business Address: Windsor Radiological Association
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
(519) 256-4914

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clear Medical Imaging
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 256-4914
Fax: (519) 256-4358
Address: Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot St W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: 519-326-2373
Extension: 4416
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A1E1
Phone: 519-972-4411
Extension: 37527
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brigitte Ala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ala (CPSO#: 63766 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: Windsor Radiological Associates
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
(519) 256-4914
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4412 Extn: 37531
Business Address: Windsor Radiological Association
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
(519) 256-4914

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE DARLEEN ALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE DARLEEN ALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Jun 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Jun 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991