THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:48:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anderson (CPSO#: 63769 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
(519) 667-6538

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anderson (CPSO#: 63769 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
(519) 667-6538

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT BRUCE ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT BRUCE ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991