THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 111
279 Wharncliffe Road
London Ontario N6H 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-0275
Fax: (519) 661-0616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Mar 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: De Odorico Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. De Odorico (CPSO#: 63771 )
Business Address: 111 - 279 Wharncliffe Road North
London Ontario N6H 2C2
(519) 661-0275

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 111
279 Wharncliffe Road
London Ontario N6H 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-0275
Fax: (519) 661-0616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Mar 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: De Odorico Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. De Odorico (CPSO#: 63771 )
Business Address: 111 - 279 Wharncliffe Road North
London Ontario N6H 2C2
(519) 661-0275

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRIS DE ODORICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ODORICO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRIS DE ODORICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ODORICO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991