THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:22:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville Ontario K6V 5J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 498-0444
Fax: (613) 498-4850

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ambrose Au & Dr. Lydia Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Au (CPSO#: 68837 ) Dr. L. Lo (CPSO#: 63775 )
Business Address: 60 California Avenue
Brockville Ontario K6V 5W1
(613) 498-5900
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5645
Business Address: Invista Canada Health Centre
1400 County Road # 2E
P O Box 611
Maitland Ontario K0E 1P0
(613) 348-4225
Business Address: Cornerstone Family Medical Centre
106 - 100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville Ontario K6V 5J9
(613) 498-0444
Business Address: Procter & Gamble Inc
1475 California Avenue
Brockville Ontario K6V 6K4
(613) 342-9592

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville Ontario K6V 5J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 498-0444
Fax: (613) 498-4850

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ambrose Au & Dr. Lydia Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Au (CPSO#: 68837 ) Dr. L. Lo (CPSO#: 63775 )
Business Address: 60 California Avenue
Brockville Ontario K6V 5W1
(613) 498-5900
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5645
Business Address: Invista Canada Health Centre
1400 County Road # 2E
P O Box 611
Maitland Ontario K0E 1P0
(613) 348-4225
Business Address: Cornerstone Family Medical Centre
106 - 100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville Ontario K6V 5J9
(613) 498-0444
Business Address: Procter & Gamble Inc
1475 California Avenue
Brockville Ontario K6V 6K4
(613) 342-9592

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYDIA CHING LUEN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYDIA CHING LUEN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991