THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Div. of General & Thoracic Surgery
Room 1518
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6405
Fax: (416) 813-7477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Surgery
Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 03 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Priscilla Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chiu (CPSO#: 63794 )
Business Address: Division of Pediatric General and
Thoracic Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
1518 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6405

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Div. of General & Thoracic Surgery
Room 1518
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6405
Fax: (416) 813-7477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Surgery
Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 03 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Priscilla Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chiu (CPSO#: 63794 )
Business Address: Division of Pediatric General and
Thoracic Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
1518 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6405

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRISCILLA PUI LAM CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRISCILLA PUI LAM CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991