THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 420 Cooper Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 233-4697
Fax: (613) 233-4541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Geller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geller (CPSO#: 63806 )
Business Address: 420 Cooper Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2N6
(613) 233-4697

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 420 Cooper Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 233-4697
Fax: (613) 233-4541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Geller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geller (CPSO#: 63806 )
Business Address: 420 Cooper Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 2N6
(613) 233-4697

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL ANNE GELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL ANNE GELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991