THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2903
Fax: (613) 721-4774

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chamberlain (CPSO#: 63807 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2903
Fax: (613) 721-4774

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chamberlain (CPSO#: 63807 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE WALTER WELLINGTON CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE WALTER WELLINGTON CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991