THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:52:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameron Guest Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Guest (CPSO#: 63839 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4522

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameron Guest Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Guest (CPSO#: 63839 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4522

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON BURTON GUEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUEST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON BURTON GUEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUEST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991