THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:35:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Ann Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Richardson (CPSO#: 63843 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Ann Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Richardson (CPSO#: 63843 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ANN RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ANN RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991