THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:13:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2157 Royal Windsor Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2893731089
Fax: 8664831781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Little Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Little (CPSO#: 63847 )
Business Address: 209 - 400 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 0H7
(905) 636-1888
Business Address: 2157 Royal Windsor Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1K5
289-373-1089

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2157 Royal Windsor Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2893731089
Fax: 8664831781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Little Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Little (CPSO#: 63847 )
Business Address: 209 - 400 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 0H7
(905) 636-1888
Business Address: 2157 Royal Windsor Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1K5
289-373-1089

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET GAIL LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET GAIL LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991