THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph G.I. & Surgery Clinic
21 Surrey Street west
Suite 105
Guelph Ontario N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 836-8201
Fax: (519) 836-1341

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 19 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James C. Hewak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hewak (CPSO#: 63856 )
Business Address: 105 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph Ontario N1H 3R3
(519) 836-8201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph G.I. & Surgery Clinic
21 Surrey Street west
Suite 105
Guelph Ontario N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 836-8201
Fax: (519) 836-1341

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 19 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James C. Hewak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hewak (CPSO#: 63856 )
Business Address: 105 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph Ontario N1H 3R3
(519) 836-8201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES CHRISTOPHER HEWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEWAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES CHRISTOPHER HEWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEWAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991