THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1A
6758 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 286-7890
Fax: (416) 286-8600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davies (CPSO#: 63858 )
Business Address: 1A-6758 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 1G8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1A
6758 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 286-7890
Fax: (416) 286-8600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davies (CPSO#: 63858 )
Business Address: 1A-6758 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 1G8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CERI JANE DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CERI JANE DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991