THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:54:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107 - 81 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 234-5442
Fax: (416) 234-1483
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: (416) 234-1483

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Al-Hashmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Al-Hashmi (CPSO#: 63864 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107 - 81 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 234-5442
Fax: (416) 234-1483
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: (416) 234-1483

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Al-Hashmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Al-Hashmi (CPSO#: 63864 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MURTADA MOHAMMED AL-HASHMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HASHMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MURTADA MOHAMMED AL-HASHMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HASHMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991