THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:19:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 686-6411
Extension: 53119
Fax: 905-444-6687
Address: Lakeridge Health
300 Gordon ST
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-444-6688
Fax: 905-444-6687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Buldo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Buldo (CPSO#: 63871 )
Business Address: 300 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 3119
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 686-6411
Extension: 53119
Fax: 905-444-6687
Address: Lakeridge Health
300 Gordon ST
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-444-6688
Fax: 905-444-6687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Buldo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Buldo (CPSO#: 63871 )
Business Address: 300 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 3119
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE PAUL BULDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE PAUL BULDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991