THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:58:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-2700
Fax: (905) 303-2780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Sen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sen (CPSO#: 63880 )
Business Address: Suite C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H6
(905) 303-2700

Corporation Name: Dr. Roger Sen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-2700
Fax: (905) 303-2780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Sen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sen (CPSO#: 63880 )
Business Address: Suite C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H6
(905) 303-2700

Corporation Name: Dr. Roger Sen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER INDRARAJ SEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER INDRARAJ SEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991