THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pure Spa
1936 Avenue rd
Toronto Ontario M5M4A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 6590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4 Checkley
Barrie ON L4N 1W1
Phone: 1-705-730-0888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 136 Cartwright Ave
North York ON M6A 1V2
Phone: 4167894268
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 4168405991
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 190 Wilson Ave
North York ON M5M 4N7
Phone: 4164812888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1936 Avenue Rd
North York ON M5M 4A1
Phone: 4165464664
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2R 1N5
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1760 Finch Ave E
Seneca College
North York ON M2J 5G3
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1633 Wilson Ave
Downsview Arena
North York ON M3L 1A5
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 941 Progress Ave
Centennial College
Scarborough ON M1G 3T8
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: B2-670 Taunton Rd E
Whitby ON L1R 0K6
Phone: 9056557100
Fax: 9056557155

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilona Dreyzin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Dreyzin (CPSO#: 63883 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 3030 Lawrenece Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pure Spa
1936 Avenue rd
Toronto Ontario M5M4A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 6590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4 Checkley
Barrie ON L4N 1W1
Phone: 1-705-730-0888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 136 Cartwright Ave
North York ON M6A 1V2
Phone: 4167894268
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 4168405991
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 190 Wilson Ave
North York ON M5M 4N7
Phone: 4164812888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1936 Avenue Rd
North York ON M5M 4A1
Phone: 4165464664
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2R 1N5
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1760 Finch Ave E
Seneca College
North York ON M2J 5G3
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1633 Wilson Ave
Downsview Arena
North York ON M3L 1A5
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 941 Progress Ave
Centennial College
Scarborough ON M1G 3T8
Phone: 4166590704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: B2-670 Taunton Rd E
Whitby ON L1R 0K6
Phone: 9056557100
Fax: 9056557155

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilona Dreyzin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Dreyzin (CPSO#: 63883 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 3030 Lawrenece Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILONA DREYZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DREYZIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILONA DREYZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DREYZIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991