THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:51:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1750 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 7Y6
Business Email: info@ottawaplasticsurgery.com
Phone: 6137924137
Fax: 613-792-1522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard J. Silverman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Silverman (CPSO#: 63891 )
Business Address: 1-1750 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 7Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1750 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 7Y6
Business Email: info@ottawaplasticsurgery.com
Phone: 6137924137
Fax: 613-792-1522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard J. Silverman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Silverman (CPSO#: 63891 )
Business Address: 1-1750 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 7Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD JEFFREY SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD JEFFREY SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Jan 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Jan 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991