THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:07:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1400-700 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 978-8030
Fax: 416 971-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: 1-888-563-3732 or 416-398-0638
Date Received: 11 Nov 2013

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Mingo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mingo (CPSO#: 63920 )
Business Address: 214 College Street
Suite 232
Toronto Ontario M5T 2Z9
(416) 978-8030
Business Address: 1400-700 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1Z6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1400-700 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 978-8030
Fax: 416 971-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: 1-888-563-3732 or 416-398-0638
Date Received: 11 Nov 2013

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Mingo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mingo (CPSO#: 63920 )
Business Address: 214 College Street
Suite 232
Toronto Ontario M5T 2Z9
(416) 978-8030
Business Address: 1400-700 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1Z6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY SABINA MINGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINGO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY SABINA MINGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINGO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991