THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:38:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15-630 Peter Robertson Blvd
Springdale Medical Centre
Brampton ON L6R 1T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-793-8868
Fax: 905-793-8957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geetha Rao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rao (CPSO#: 63921 )
Business Address: 180 Sandalwood Parkway
Brampton Ontario L6Z 1Y4
(905) 846-9255

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15-630 Peter Robertson Blvd
Springdale Medical Centre
Brampton ON L6R 1T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-793-8868
Fax: 905-793-8957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geetha Rao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rao (CPSO#: 63921 )
Business Address: 180 Sandalwood Parkway
Brampton Ontario L6Z 1Y4
(905) 846-9255

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEETHA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEETHA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991