THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:44:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gates of Maple Family Practice
201- 955 Major Mackenzie Dr. W.
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054177899
Fax: (905) 417-8905

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salma Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kassam (CPSO#: 63936 )
Business Address: Gates of Maple Family Practice
201 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 417-7899

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gates of Maple Family Practice
201- 955 Major Mackenzie Dr. W.
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054177899
Fax: (905) 417-8905

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salma Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kassam (CPSO#: 63936 )
Business Address: Gates of Maple Family Practice
201 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 417-7899

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMA KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMA KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991