THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Oct 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can access a copy of their medical record by contacting The Toronto GI Clinic Corporation at 416-322-7517.
Date Received: 30 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marina Khatchatourian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khatchatourian (CPSO#: 63937 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN, PERSIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Oct 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can access a copy of their medical record by contacting The Toronto GI Clinic Corporation at 416-322-7517.
Date Received: 30 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marina Khatchatourian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khatchatourian (CPSO#: 63937 )

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991