THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:59:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 46
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 868-8330
Fax: (905) 868-8332
Address: 535 Mulock Dr
All Med Health
Suite 102
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
Phone: 9058688330
Fax: 9058688332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David G Yip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yip (CPSO#: 63950 )
Business Address: 46 - 1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8X2
(905) 868-8330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 46
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 868-8330
Fax: (905) 868-8332
Address: 535 Mulock Dr
All Med Health
Suite 102
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
Phone: 9058688330
Fax: 9058688332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David G Yip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yip (CPSO#: 63950 )
Business Address: 46 - 1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8X2
(905) 868-8330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GEMIN YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GEMIN YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991