THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:19:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centenary Health Centre Site
Galaxy 12
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Durno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Durno (CPSO#: 63982 )
Business Address: Centenary Health Centre
Clinic 12
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7476
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6185

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centenary Health Centre Site
Galaxy 12
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Durno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Durno (CPSO#: 63982 )
Business Address: Centenary Health Centre
Clinic 12
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7476
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6185

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL ANNE DURNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURNO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL ANNE DURNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURNO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991