THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:01:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Room HSC 3Y
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76610
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76610
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 293 Wellington Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 8E7
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46827
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RJ Lloyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Room HSC 3Y
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76610
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76610
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 293 Wellington Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 8E7
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46827
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RJ Lloyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JEFFREY LLOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LLOYD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JEFFREY LLOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LLOYD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991