THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Hollandview Trail
suite 300
Aurora Ontario L4G 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-727-9481
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mona Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ma (CPSO#: 63998 )
Business Address: 200 - 15017 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 1M5
(905) 727-9481
Business Address: 300-372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora Ontario L4G 0A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Hollandview Trail
suite 300
Aurora Ontario L4G 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-727-9481
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mona Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ma (CPSO#: 63998 )
Business Address: 200 - 15017 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 1M5
(905) 727-9481
Business Address: 300-372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora Ontario L4G 0A5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONA MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONA MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991